U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order of Reassignement/Recusal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.