U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cramer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Protective Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.