U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00531-PAB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Prepare Transcript]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Judgment ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.