U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00078-JJH-6
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Travel ]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [In Limine ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.