U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • April 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Medical Treatment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.