U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00094-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.