U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00011-JRK-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Mickles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order of Recusal/Reassignment]
  • May 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.