U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendiola-Vanegas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.