U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pyett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.