U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00295-JRA-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Fortson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • May 08, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Compel ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 29, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Compel ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sanctions ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disqualify Judge ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Suppress ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Bond ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.