U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00110-JGC-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Al Najjar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.