U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.