U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00042-CAB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 21, 2025: [Quash ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.