U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00326-JZ-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Order]
  • May 20, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.