U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00298-BMB-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Drake, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2025: [Order]
  • May 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Travel ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 13, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.