U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sumner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Order]
  • May 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 21, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.