U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00220-BYP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Corn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.