U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Revoke]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 07, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 02, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.