U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00143-JRK-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Garcia-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.