U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00160-JRA-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Corbin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • May 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • May 08, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Prepare Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.