U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00140-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.