U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diego-Sevilla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 08, 2025: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
  • May 07, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Related Case Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.