U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00020-DAP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gilbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.