U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 04, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.