U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00077-JZ-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kimble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bond ]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.