U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00145-JJH-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.