U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berndt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bond Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Related Case Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.