U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.