U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00348-PAG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 15, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Judgment ]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.