U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 23, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 22, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 22, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.