U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGhee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2025: [Protective Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.