U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00172-BYP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.