U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Rojas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 23, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.