open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00029-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Rodriguez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment & Commitment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Jury Trial]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oath of Interpreter]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Interpreter]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105945
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =