Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00129
    Party Name:Shepherd v. RSM Development Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105967
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =