open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00131
    Party Name:Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Dobbins Ranch LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proof of Service by Publication]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oath of Receiver]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105970
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =