Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00240
    Party Name:Campbell v. Circle K Stores Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Address Change]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106267
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =