Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00239
    Party Name:McNeary et al v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106266
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =