open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00247
    Party Name:Packard Inc v. Wilspec Technologies Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Exhibit]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Subpoena]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Regarding Patent and Trademark]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106285
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =