Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00242
    Party Name:United States Department of Labor v. Ghosn et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Response]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106284
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =