open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00337
    Party Name:Burk v. IQ Data International Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Closing Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106556
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =