open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00446
    Party Name:Lively et al v. Skidmore et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106896
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =