open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00246-1
    Party Name:USA v. Guoladdle
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Jury Trial]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107728
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =