open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:19-13331
    Party Name:Steven E. Gregg and Dawna R. Gregg
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing - Chp 13]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (multi)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Objection to Confirmation and Request for Hearing - batch (trustee)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Intent to Pay Claims (trustee)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [CCC / FMC dates]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?303746
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =