open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00839
    Party Name:Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. LL Oak Two LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?108104
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =