open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00838
    Party Name:Gill v. Loop Management LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?108099
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =