open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:19-11878-M
    Party Name:John Raymond Willis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Final Decree. Case Closed.]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Financial Management ADI Only]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Financial Management Course Certification]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.oknb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?149412
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =