open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-01138
    Party Name:Harp v. Barr
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109028
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =