open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00372-23
    Party Name:USA v. Dominquez et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waive and File Hearing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Jury Trial]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice from the Court]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Notice]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Address Change]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joinder]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reservation of Detention Hearing & Order]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Interpreter]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oath of Interpreter]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appearance Bond]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109001
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =