open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-01137
    Party Name:Parks v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Previous Cases]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109025
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =